U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKenzie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2020: [Amend]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 11, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 11, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.