U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 08, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 11, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.