U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sykes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 28, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 07, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 17, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.