U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daigle et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 01, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • August 17, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 04, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 17, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 07, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Organizational Victim]
  • May 29, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 28, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • May 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 27, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 24, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 24, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 24, 2020: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 24, 2020: [Seal Case]
  • April 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.