U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saldana
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 14, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 12, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.