U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 04, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 16, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 24, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 22, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 09, 2020: [Assent to Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • July 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 26, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 22, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 22, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 22, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.