U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Status of Counsel]
  • August 10, 2020: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • July 21, 2020: [Bail]
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 07, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 07, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.