U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bjork
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 13, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2021: [Addendum]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Status of Counsel]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 27, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2021: [Amend]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 21, 2020: [Continue Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 13, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.