U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 25, 2020: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bail]
  • August 21, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • July 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2020: [Arrest]
  • July 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.