U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stottlar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amend]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2022: [Suppress]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 26, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Exhibit]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 22, 2022: [Amend]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 18, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Discovery]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • January 10, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • January 10, 2022: [Bail Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Bail]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Assent to Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 19, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • August 05, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Addendum]
  • June 09, 2021: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • February 10, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • February 05, 2021: [Bail]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2020: [Bail]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Subpoena]
  • November 19, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • September 16, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Response - not to motion]
  • August 26, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 25, 2020: [Addendum]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • August 21, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • August 14, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 12, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amend]
  • August 05, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • August 05, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 05, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 24, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 23, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 23, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 23, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.