U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shawn Wills
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 28, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • July 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 28, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 28, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.