open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00842
    Party Name:Simonds v. Office of Public Guardian
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - ECF]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal - New Case]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nhd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54562
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =