open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:20-10729-
    Party Name:Glen Hunter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Administrative Error - Order Striking Document Filed Into Incorrect Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Clerk Notice of Dismissed Case (521(a)(1) CASES ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [341 Meeting Call-in Information Telephonic (BATCH)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Clerk Notice of Contingent Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Notice to File Missing Documents (CH. 13)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (ADI)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sumski, Lawrence P. [Creditor Request for Notice (LIMITED USERS ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Creditor Request for Notice (LIMITED USERS ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (CH. 13) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117174
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =