U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shackford et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Reset Hearings PUBLIC]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extend Time]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Amend]
  • February 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2021: [Amend]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 15, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 13, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • October 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 08, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • October 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Arrest]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 15, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 11, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 11, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 09, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 08, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 08, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 04, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 03, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 01, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 01, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 01, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.