U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pierro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 08, 2022: [Amend]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Exhibit]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • August 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • November 05, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • September 10, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 01, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.