U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alex Stoltman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • September 16, 2020: [Bail]
  • September 11, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 11, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • September 11, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 04, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 04, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 04, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 04, 2020: [Seal Case]
  • September 04, 2020: [Complaint - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.