U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warren
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 17, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • December 01, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 11, 2020: [Arrest]
  • September 08, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.