U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2021: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 06, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 22, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • September 22, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 09, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 09, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 09, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.