U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stockwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 10, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 02, 2021: [Downward Departure]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 22, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • September 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.