U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aceituno et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • January 02, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • December 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • March 24, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 01, 2021: [Amend]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 02, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Organizational Victim]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 24, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 08, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 28, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • September 25, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 22, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2020: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 15, 2020: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • September 10, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.