U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guillermo-Graseki
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 15, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • December 01, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 15, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 15, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 15, 2020: [Seal Case]
  • September 15, 2020: [Complaint - Sealed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.