U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGarry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • June 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 13, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Probation 12BOrder]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.