U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.