open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:20-10814-
    Party Name:Mary G. Stuart
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [341 Meeting Call-in Information Telephonic (BATCH)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Creditor Request for Notice (LIMITED USERS ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Indiv No Asset (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Timothy P. [Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117261
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =