U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extend Time]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 20, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 12, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 23, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 23, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 25, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • September 21, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 17, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 17, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.