U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 09, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amend]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 10, 2021: [Forfeiture]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.