U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gagnon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 09, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 22, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.