U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Assent to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 19, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 22, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.