U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lemus-Villatoro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 25, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 24, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • September 23, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 23, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • September 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 23, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.