U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 15, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2020: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 23, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 23, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.