U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
  • January 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2021: [Return of Property]
  • January 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 07, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Collateral Receipt]
  • October 07, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.