U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra-Meza
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • October 06, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.