U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 15, 2021: [Special Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extend Time]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • August 26, 2021: [Bifurcate]
  • August 24, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • August 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 25, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Amend]
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 28, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.