U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKinney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 05, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 29, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.