U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 27, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 26, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Addendum]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • February 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 19, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Collateral Receipt]
  • November 12, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 03, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 02, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing Letter/Impact Statement - Public]
  • October 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 01, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.