U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinchamba-Tenesaca
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Collateral Receipt]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • October 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.