U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moynihan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 13, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 12, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.