U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wagner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Return of Property]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 13, 2023: [Court Instructions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Question]
  • January 13, 2023: [JERS Certification of Exhibits]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 09, 2023: [Jury Trial]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2023: [Order]
  • January 08, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 08, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Jury Selection]
  • January 04, 2023: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2023: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 02, 2023: [Compel]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 29, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 28, 2022: [Jury Selection List]
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 27, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • December 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 27, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 27, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 27, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • December 23, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Juror Questionnaires - Supplement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • December 20, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • December 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 07, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2022: [Exceed]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • September 26, 2022: [Clarify]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • September 19, 2022: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 16, 2022: [Surreply to Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 13, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Exceed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • June 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Exceed]
  • June 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 21, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • April 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 04, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 18, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • March 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Exceed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2022: [Surreply to Reply]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • February 03, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Exceed]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 26, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion (Court Use)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • October 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • October 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Addendum]
  • October 06, 2021: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • October 05, 2021: [Exceed]
  • October 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 20, 2021: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • July 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 09, 2021: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • October 07, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 05, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2020: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2020: [Recusal Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Rule 21 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.