U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2021: [Amend]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 09, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 05, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 05, 2020: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • October 05, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.