U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navarro Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2021: [Bail Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Bail]
  • July 02, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Trial Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 24, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 06, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 06, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.