U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roukey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
  • July 01, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 10, 2022: [Suppress]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2021: [Amend]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 28, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • December 18, 2020: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • December 18, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • December 18, 2020: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • December 18, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Arrest]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 22, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 22, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 06, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 06, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.