U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vazquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
  • April 15, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extend Time]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 08, 2021: [Addendum]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 10, 2021: [Continue Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • February 11, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 06, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 06, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.