U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maza-Maza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2021: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • March 24, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 07, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 07, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 07, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.