U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schneider
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 13, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2020: [Waiver of]
  • October 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 09, 2020: [Arrest]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.