U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LNU
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Extend Time to Indict]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice - Other]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • April 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 08, 2020: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 20, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.