U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKnight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 10, 2022: [Addendum]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Bail Hearing]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • November 17, 2020: [Bail]
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 21, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • October 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • October 15, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 14, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 14, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.