open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

NEW HAMPSHIRE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Hampshire
    Case Number:20-10890-
    Party Name:Leo Prokopovich
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [341 Meeting Call-in Information Telephonic (BATCH)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Olga L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Indiv No Asset (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notice (LIMITED USERS ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nhb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117343
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =