U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cote
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 14, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 19, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • November 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.