U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tito
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2024: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 01, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • November 23, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 19, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 17, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 17, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 17, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.