U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sacara
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2020: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • December 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • December 07, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Collateral Receipt]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 18, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 18, 2020: [Arrest]
  • November 18, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • November 18, 2020: [Seal Case]
  • November 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.